State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Haier America Company LLC
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Haier America Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00412
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 8/6/2019; Jury Trial set for the term beginning 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 08:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 2/6/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2019; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 9/3/2019; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 11/6/2019; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 12/6/2019; Motions due by 2/20/2020; Settlement Conference set for 1/16/2020 02:00 PM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson; ADR Report due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/9/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
August 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/2/2019. Participants: Michael Herrin and Leah Nichols Ledford. A Case Management Order will be entered. (Lewis, Nijah)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 State Court Record by Defendant Haier America Company LLC Volumes 1 (Ledford, Leah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Haier America Company LLC.(Ledford, Leah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Haier America Company LLC from Circuit Court of Scott County, MS, case number 2019-cv-125-SC-CC. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4011849) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Haier America Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael D. Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haier America Company LLC
Represented By: Leah Nichols Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?