Divine v. Mississippi
Petitioner: Abraham Divine
Respondent: Mississippi
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00418
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Rehearing in re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Abraham Divine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 USCA ORDER denying Motion to file successive petition filed by Movant Mr. Abraham Divine. (Attachments: #1 USCA Cover Letter)(ND)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PETITION - IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this Petition #1 for habeas corpus relief be, and the same hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. IT IS, FURTHER, ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case pending the decision of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 7/2/2019 (ND)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Abraham Divine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Abraham Divine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Abraham Divine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Divine v. Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abraham Divine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mississippi
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?