Ewing v. Gibson et al
Plaintiff: Ricky R. Ewing
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Arnold and Mr. Unknown Gibson
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00420
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 8/13/19 (LAT)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 8/13/19 (LAT)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 8/13/19 (LAT)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE re #2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ricky R. Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) Modified on 6/27/2019 (LAT). Modified on 6/27/2019 (LAT).
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Letter/MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Ricky R. Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Amended Complaint/IFP, #2 Envelope)(LAT) Modified on 6/25/2019 (LAT). Modified on 6/27/2019 (LAT).
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ricky R. Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Arnold, Unknown Gibson, filed by Ricky R. Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #1- Mississippi Department of Corrections Administrative Remedy Program, #2 Exhibit B #2- Mississippi Department of Corrections Administrative Remedy Program First Step Response Form, #3 Exhibit C #3 Mississippi Department of Corrections Administrative Remedy Program Second Step Response Form, #4 Envelope, #5 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Plaintiff's current address listed on docket sheet.)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. Gibson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Unknown Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Unknown Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky R. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?