Freeman v. Provost et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius Terrell Freeman
Defendant: Unknown Does 1-2 and Lieutenant Unknown Provost
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00421
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum from the Court Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Documents Submitted by Plaintiff Freeman) (LAT) Modified on 8/15/2019 (LAT).
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed as to Attorney General of the United States/United States Department of Justice served on 8/7/2019 in re #7 Order. (LAT) Modified on 8/13/2019 (LAT).
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Civil Process Clerk served on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (LAT)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Demetrius T. Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (LAT)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Unknown Provost. (CS)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHAL, Clerk is directed to issue summons to Defendant Provost. The USM is directed to serve Defendant and is directed to file the return on or before September 3, 2019. Defendant Provost shall file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 08/01/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 08/01/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and United States Penitentiary Florence] (CS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #4 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Demetrius Terrell Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LAT)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 7/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 06/18/2019. (CS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Jury Demand by Demetrius Terrell Freeman (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Demetrius Terrell Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (BIVENS) with JURY DEMAND against Unknown Does 1-2, Unknown Provost, filed by Demetrius Terrell Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Plaintiff's current address listed on docket sheet.)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Provost et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Unknown Provost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Terrell Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?