Rush v. Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Defendant: Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00422
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike #3 Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se Registration for Electronic Receipt of Court Filings. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MGB)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 6/19/2019. Copy mailed to plaintiff at address listed on docket sheet. (AC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis, filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Car and Truck Rental of Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?