Rush v. Carmax et al
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Defendant: Allied Solutions, LLC, American Credit Acceptance and Carmax
Case Number: 3:2019cv00423
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of USCA as to #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Zorri N. Rush : On the showing made, IT IS ORDERED that Appellant's motion to suspend injunction pending appeal is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Appellant's motion to place case under seal is DENIED. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KNS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Appeal Remark re #9 Notice of Appeal : CLERK ORDER denying Motion for leave of court to file electronically. (KNS)
August 2, 2019 Certified and Electronically Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal. (KNS)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER sustaining #10 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis as set out in the Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on July 18, 2019. (SP)
July 17, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-60510 for #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Zorri N. Rush. (KNS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Appeal Remark re #9 Notice of Appeal : Initial Case Check Letter to Zorri N. Rush advising of case number and procedures. (KNS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Zorri N. Rush. (KNS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order Dismissing Case and #8 Judgment by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. This case is dismissed without prejudice for improper venue; Rush is hereby sanctioned for failing to heed the Court's warnings and enjoined from seeking IFP status unless he clearly pleads plausible facts demonstrating on the face of the complaint that venue is proper in this district and that the case has not been previously dismissed on the merits; and finally, all future cases in this district will be assigned to the undersigned judge. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 6/28/2019 (VM)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice for improper venue. A separate final judgment will be entered in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Rush is hereby sanctioned for failing to heed the Court's warnings and enjoined from seeking IFP status unless he clearly pleads plausible facts demonstrating on the face of the complaint that venue is proper in this district and that the case has not been previously dismissed on the merits. Finally, all future cases in this district will be assigned to the undersigned judge. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 6/28/2019 (VM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Response to Order re #4 ORDER filed by Zorri N. Rush (Attachments: #1 *Attachment pages 1 and 2 of 3 re copy of doc 8 in 3:19cv230, #2 Envelope)(KNS) (*page 3 not submitted)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on June 21, 2019.(SP)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Zorri N. Rush. (KNS) (copy given to KA, Operations) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2019: #1 Envelope) (KNS).
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Solutions, LLC, American Credit Acceptance, Carmax, filed by Zorri N. Rush. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for Carmax, #2 Civil Cover Sheet for American Credit Acceptance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet for Allied Solutions, LLC, #4 Envelope)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Carmax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Credit Acceptance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zorri N. Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?