McKeighan v. Rivers
Plaintiff: James McKeighan
Defendant: C. Rivers
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00425
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Response in Opposition re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James McKeighan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DHO Appeal, #2 Exhibit BOP Grievance, #3 Exhibit BOP Medical Records, #4 Notice of Assignment, # 5 Envelope) (NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)(MGB) filed by C. Rivers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, DHO Report, #2 Exhibit B, Public Inmate Data, #3 Exhibit C, Administrative Remedy Retrieval, #4 Exhibit D, Incident Report)(Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov on behalf of C. Rivers (Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
August 2, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 . Incorrect date of Service was entered. Entry has been modified to show correct date of 7/29/19 and answer due 8/19/19. (PKM)
August 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: C. Rivers answer due 8/19/2019. (PKM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to C. Rivers served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (PKM) Modified on 8/2/2019 (PKM).
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt by Attorney General of U.S. DOJ on 07/29/19 filed. (KNS)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Respondent C. Rivers shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this case within 20 days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/25/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Respondent to Produce Joseph Ransom's Signed Statement by James McKeighan (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKM)
July 3, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 34643055471 (MGB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Plaintiff James McKeighan (copy of docket sheet forwarded to plaintiff.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PKM)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, on or before July 22, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/20/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James McKeighan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DHO Appeal, #2 Exhibit BOP Grievance, #3 Exhibit BOP Medical Records, #4 Notice of Assignment, #5 Envelope) (NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKeighan v. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McKeighan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rivers
Represented By: J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?