Grant v. Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Plaintiff: Calvin C. Grant
Defendant: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation, Shelia Anderson, John Doe Company or Agency and VerLillian Kaye Grant Wynn
Case Number: 3:2019cv00437
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Calvin C. Grant (Robinson, Abby)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce H. James-Federal Gov on behalf of Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (James-Federal Gov, Bruce)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Shelia Anderson. (cwl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to VerLillian Kaye Grant Wynn. (cwl)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants, filed by Calvin C. Grant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit marriage Certificate, #2 Exhibit Child support judgment, #3 Exhibit Birth certificate, #4 Exhibit statement)(Robinson, Abby)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Case-Federal Gov on behalf of Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Calvin C. Grant. Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Robinson, Abby)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (VM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4018774), filed by Calvin C. Grant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order, #2 Exhibit B - Child Birth Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin C. Grant
Represented By: Abby Gale Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Case-Federal Gov
Represented By: Bruce H. James-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Company or Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VerLillian Kaye Grant Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?