Moore v. Johnson & Johnson
Plaintiff: Rosie Moore
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00450
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 NOTICE: Case transferred from Mississippi Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 3:19-cv-15016, filed 07/10/2019. (LAT)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey.(LAT)
July 10, 2019 District Transfer Out to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (LAT)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER- to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey on 7/10/19. (LAT)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/3/2019 (SR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 MDL NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Related Cases, #2 Cover Letter)(ND)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson & Johnson (Mitchell, Meade)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Johnson & Johnson from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 19-302. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4023110) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certified copy of state court record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Moore
Represented By: Damon R. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Meade W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?