The University of Mississippi Medical Center v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: The University of Mississippi Medical Center
Defendant: Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Linnea McMillan, Spencer K. Sullivan, Kathryn Sue Stevens and Rachel Henderson Harris
Case Number: 3:2019cv00459
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 2/13/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Brandy M. Lee is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant Rachel Henderson Harris in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 2/13/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
February 13, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #45 : Motion and exhibits are filed as one main document. Exhibits should be scanned separately and docketed as properly identified attachments to the main document within the same docket entry.Attorney is directed to follow this procedure in future filings. L.U.Civ.R. 7.(b)(2). (KNS)
February 13, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Brandy Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4207394) by Rachel Henderson Harris (Clark, John)
February 10, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Allen, Matthew)
February 6, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Service of Second Set of Request for Production by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Greenlee, Robert)
January 29, 2020 Filing 42 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Lisa M. Sullivan, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Document Requests)(Watson, Benjamin)
January 29, 2020 Filing 41 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Document Requests, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Aubrey McMillan)(Watson, Benjamin)
January 24, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA on Lisa M. Sullivan, MD and Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena Duces Tecum to Lisa M. Sullivan, MD, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A - Document Requests, #3 Exhibit B - Subpoena Duces Tecum to Miss. State Bd. of Medical Licensure, #4 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B - Document Requests, #5 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit B - Affidavit of Aubrey McMillan)(Watson, Benjamin)
January 22, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Clark, IV on behalf of Rachel Henderson Harris (Clark, John)
January 20, 2020 Filing 38 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Kayla Peeler Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Document Requests)(Greenlee, Robert)
January 20, 2020 Filing 37 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Jordan Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Document Requests)(Greenlee, Robert)
January 15, 2020 Filing 36 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Haddox Reid Eubanks Betts PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Document Requests)(Watson, Benjamin)
January 14, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA Duces Tecum by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Greenlee, Robert)
January 14, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA on Haddox Reid Eubanks Betts PLLC by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena Duces Tecum to Haddox Reid Eubanks Betts PLLC, #2 Exhibit 1 to Subpoena Duces Tecum to Haddox Reid Eubanks Betts PLLC)(Watson, Benjamin)
January 10, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA Duces Tecum by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Duces Tecum)(Greenlee, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Greenlee, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Greenlee, Robert)
January 6, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Allen, Matthew)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Discovery will proceed on the Trade Secrets Claim. Discovery on all other claims remains stayed pending ruling on pending motions. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/6/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The Court notes the trial date is tentative; parties are not required to duplicate any discovery previously provided. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 9/2/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2020; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 6/2/2020 ; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 7/2/2020 ; Motions due by 9/16/2020 ; Settlement Conference set for 8/19/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson ; ADR Report due by 1/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/6/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
December 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Status Conference/Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/6/2019. Participants: Ben Watson, Robert Greenlee, Charlene Stimley Priester, Melvin Priest, Jr. and Matt Allen. The Court conducted a motion hearing and discussed case management deadlines. The Court notes the trial date is tentative; parties are not required to duplicate any discovery previously provided. (Lewis, Nijah)
November 22, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/6/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2019 re #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings until Resolution of the Pending Motion to Dismiss filed by Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Rachel Henderson Harris, Spencer K. Sullivan. Participants: Robert Greenlee and Matt Allen. The Court heard argument. CMC to be conducted in approximately 30 days. Discovery is stayed until that date. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 18, 2019 Filing 28 Rebuttal re #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings until Resolution of the Pending Motion to Dismiss filed by Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Allen, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings until Resolution of the Pending Motion to Dismiss, #26 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Abernethy, Phillip)
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings until Resolution of the Pending Motion to Dismiss filed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Abernethy, Phillip)
October 4, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings until Resolution of the Pending Motion to Dismiss : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. Counsel for Defendant shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER. Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Stay is due 10/11/19; Reply Due 10/18/19. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/4/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
October 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/4/2019. Participants: Phillip Abernethy, Ben Watson, Robert Greenlee, Sheldon Alston, Charlene Stimley Priester, Melvin Priester and Matt Allen. The Court spoke with counsel. Plaintiff will file response to Motion to Stay no later than 10/11/19; Reply Due 10/18/19. Hearing to be set week of 10-28-19. (Lewis, Nijah)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C. (Priester, Melvin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings until Resolution of the Pending Motion to Dismiss filed by Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Allen, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings until Resolution of the Pending Motion to Dismiss by Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Allen, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Allen on behalf of Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Allen, Matthew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, #20 Memorandum in Support, #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Priester, Melvin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Abernethy, Phillip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Abernethy, Phillip)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting as Unopposed #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 9/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 8/28/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (DJ)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Watson, Benjamin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (NL)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting as Unopposed #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 8/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 8/13/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (DJ)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Watson, Benjamin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin V. Priester, Jr on behalf of Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Priester, Melvin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Charlene Stimley Priester on behalf of Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Priester, E. Charlene)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Alston, Sheldon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, 05-26-2016 Email to Todd Dear from Spencer Sullivan, #2 Exhibit 2, UMMC's State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3, Defendants' Answer, Afffirmative Defenses and Counterclaim to State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4, UMMC's First Amended State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5, State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6, Agreed Scheduling Order in State Court Action)(Alston, Sheldon)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline B. Smith on behalf of The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Smith, Caroline)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center. Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Abernethy, Phillip)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center. Rachel Henderson Harris served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Abernethy, Phillip)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center. Kathryn Sue Stevens served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Abernethy, Phillip)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center. Spencer K. Sullivan served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Abernethy, Phillip)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center. Linnea McMillan served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Abernethy, Phillip)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert V. Greenlee on behalf of The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Greenlee, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frey on behalf of The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Frey, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin McRae Watson on behalf of The University of Mississippi Medical Center (Watson, Benjamin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer K. Sullivan. (PKM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, WITH JURY DEMAND, against Rachel Henderson Harris, Linnea McMillan, Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C., Kathryn Sue Stevens, Spencer Sullivan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4025456), filed by The University of Mississippi Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sullivan Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Physician Recruitment Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sullivan PSA 2015-2016, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sullivan Emails re: Clinic Schedule, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sullivan Emails re: New Job at UMMC, #6 Exhibit 6 - Sullivan Email to Todaro, Nov. 17, 2014, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sullivan Email to Thompson and Price, Nov. 27, 2014, #8 Exhibit 8 - Sullivan March 2015 Emails re: Patient' Use of UMMC Pharmacy, #9 Exhibit 9 - Todaro EMail to Sullivan, April. 20, 2015, #10 Exhibit 10 - Todaro EMail to Sullivan, Sept. 15, 2015, #11 Exhibit 11 - Sullivan Email to Barr, Sept. 14, 2015, #12 Exhibit 12 - Sullivan Emails re: Financials, Nov. 2015, #13 Exhibit 13 - Email Thread Between Sullivan, Dear, Megason, Barr and Giesecke, Nov. 1, #14 Exhibit 14 - Sullivan Email to Himself, Jan 2, 2016, #15 Exhibit 15 - Email thread Between Sullivan and Baugh, Jan. 20, 2016, #16 Exhibit 16 - Sullivan Email to Pinkston, Jan. 21, 2016, #17 Exhibit 17 - Sullivan Email to Pinkston, Jan. 21, 2016, #18 Exhibit 18 - Sullivan Email to Himself, Jan. 27, 2016, #19 Exhibit 19 - Email Thread Between Sullivan and Mangum, Jan. 31, 2016, #20 Exhibit 20 - Sullivan Emails, Feb. 2016, #21 Exhibit 21 - Sullivan Emails, March 2016, #22 Exhibit 22 - Sullivan Resignation letter, #23 Exhibit 23 - MCAM Articles of Incorporation, #24 Exhibit 24 - MCAM 2018 Annual Report, #25 Exhibit 25 - Sullivan Emails, April 2016, #26 Exhibit 26 - Sullivan Emails, May 2016, #27 Exhibit 27 - Sullivan CV, June 2, 2016, #28 Exhibit 28 - Sullivan Emails, June, 2016, #29 Exhibit 29 - Emails re: Theft of Patient List, #30 Exhibit 30 - Affidavit for Transfer of Document by Aubrey McMillan, #31 Exhibit 31 - MCAM Business Plan, #32 Exhibit 32 - Clarion Ledger Article, June 4, 2018, #33 Exhibit 33 - Email from Sullivan to Lisa Sullivan, July 20, 2016, #34 Exhibit 34 - Site Visit Summary, #35 Exhibit 35 - Resignation Emails, #36 Exhibit 36 - Sullivan Email Thread with Dental Division, July 2016, #37 Exhibit 37 - Email Thread re: Elocate Patients, Oct. 2016, #38 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The University of Mississippi Medical Center v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The University of Mississippi Medical Center
Represented By: Robert M. Frey
Represented By: Benjamin McRae Watson
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Represented By: Phillip B. Abernethy
Represented By: Caroline B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Center for Advanced Medicine, P.C.
Represented By: Melvin V. Priester, Jr.
Represented By: E. Charlene Stimley Priester
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Represented By: Matthew W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linnea McMillan
Represented By: Melvin V. Priester, Jr.
Represented By: E. Charlene Stimley Priester
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Represented By: Matthew W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer K. Sullivan
Represented By: Melvin V. Priester, Jr.
Represented By: E. Charlene Stimley Priester
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Represented By: Matthew W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Sue Stevens
Represented By: Melvin V. Priester, Jr.
Represented By: E. Charlene Stimley Priester
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Represented By: Matthew W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Henderson Harris
Represented By: Melvin V. Priester, Jr.
Represented By: E. Charlene Stimley Priester
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Represented By: John W. Clark, IV
Represented By: Matthew W. Allen
Represented By: Brandy Murphy Lee - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?