Upton's Naturals Co. et al v. Bryant et al
Plaintiff: Upton's Naturals Co. and The Plant Based Foods Association
Defendant: Phil Bryant and Andy Gipson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00462
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; good cause shown. All Defendants Answer due 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/9/2019. (ACF)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Phil Bryant, Andy Gipson (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Phil Bryant answer due 8/13/2019; Andy Gipson answer due 8/13/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/22/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Phil Bryant, Andy Gipson (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov on behalf of Phil Bryant, Andy Gipson (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andy Gipson, in his official capacity as Mississippi Commissioner of Agriculture and Commerce on 07/02/2019, filed by The Plant Based Foods Association, Upton's Naturals Co.. (Rice, Aaron)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Phil Bryant, in his official capacity as Mississippi Governor on 07/02/2019, filed by The Plant Based Foods Association, Upton's Naturals Co.. (Rice, Aaron)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 #5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Justin M. Pearson and Paul M. Sherman admitted for this case. Granting their #6 Motion for exemption from fee under L.U.Civ. R. 83.1(d)(5). NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/5/2019. (ACF)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Exemption from Pro Hac Vice Fee re #5 MOTION for Paul M. Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #4 MOTION for Justin M. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Plant Based Foods Association, Upton's Naturals Co. (Rice, Aaron)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Paul M. Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Plant Based Foods Association, Upton's Naturals Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Rice, Aaron)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Justin M. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Plant Based Foods Association, Upton's Naturals Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Rice, Aaron)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Plant Based Foods Association, Upton's Naturals Co. (Rice, Aaron)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Phil Bryant, Andy Gipson. (MGB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phil Bryant, Andy Gipson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4026765), filed by Upton's Naturals Co., The Plant Based Foods Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upton's Naturals Co. et al v. Bryant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Bryant
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Gipson
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upton's Naturals Co.
Represented By: Aaron Randall Rice
Represented By: Paul M. Sherman - PHV
Represented By: Justin M. Pearson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Plant Based Foods Association
Represented By: Aaron Randall Rice
Represented By: Paul M. Sherman - PHV
Represented By: Justin M. Pearson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?