Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc. et al v. Siemens Industry, Inc.
Plaintiff: Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., William S. Kellum, Charles Jordan and Belinda Chase
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00474
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Tom S Lee
2 Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joel R. Rhine is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs and in association with local counsel upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/22/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Joel R. Rhine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4068279) by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit North Carolina good standing certificate)(Hearn, Philip)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kenneth Perry, Matthew H. Lembke, Stanley Blackmon and Tiffany J. deGruy are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant, Siemens Industry, Inc., in association with local counsel and upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/20/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
August 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9 , #10 , #11 , and #12 : Motions and exhibits are filed as one main document. Exhibits should be scanned separately and docketed as properly identified attachments to the main document within the same docket entry. Attorney is directed to follow this procedure in future filings. L.U.Civ.R. 7.(b)(2). (KNS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Tiffany J. deGruy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063856) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Stanley Blackmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063848) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Matthew H. Lembke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063840) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Kenneth Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4063829) by Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy D. Campbell, III on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc. (Campbell, Roy)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER granting Defendant until 9/9/2019 to file response/answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/8/2019. (ACF)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., Charles Jordan, Belinda Chase, William S. Kellum. Siemens Industry, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Hearn, Philip)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Siemens Industry, Inc.. (ND)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., Charles Jordan, Belinda Chase, William S. Kellum as to Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Hearn, Philip)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Siemens Industry, Inc. (KNS)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlton W. Reeves recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Tom S. Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/08/19 (KNS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Siemens Industry, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4029648) filed by Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc., Charles Jordan, Belinda Chase and William S. Kellum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc. et al v. Siemens Industry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poindexter Park After-School Club, Inc.
Represented By: Philip C. Hearn
Represented By: Joel R. Rhine - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Kellum
Represented By: Philip C. Hearn
Represented By: Joel R. Rhine - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jordan
Represented By: Philip C. Hearn
Represented By: Joel R. Rhine - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Chase
Represented By: Philip C. Hearn
Represented By: Joel R. Rhine - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew H. Lembke - PHV
Represented By: Stanley Blackmon - PHV
Represented By: Roy D. Campbell, III
Represented By: Tiffany J. deGruy - PHV
Represented By: Kenneth Perry - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?