Johnson v. Haynes
Plaintiff: Archie L. Johnson
Defendant: Jasmin Haynes
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00483
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, on or before September 27, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/6/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re #6 ORDER by Archie L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KNS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #5 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Archie L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KNS)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, on or before September 3, 2019, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/1/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 9/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 8/1/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jasmin Haynes in response to #3 ORDER, filed by Archie L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before August 19, 2019, Plaintiff shall complete, sign and file the attached form entitled Form To Be Used By Prisoners In Filing A Complaint Under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. 1983." Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/18/2019. [Copy of Order and form mailed to plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Complaint Form)(LDR)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Archie L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KNS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jasmin Haynes, filed by Archie L. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - General Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Bench Warrant, #3 Exhibit D1 - copy of envelope, #4 Exhibit D2 - copy of envelope, #5 Exhibit D3 - copy of letter, #6 Exhibit D4 - copy of Motion, #7 Exhibit D5 - copy of letter, #8 Exhibit 10 - copies of letter and motion, #9 Exhibit 20 - copies of letter and motion, #10 Exhibit 21 - copy of letter, #11 Exhibit 21B - copy of letter, #12 Exhibit 22 - copy of letter, #13 Exhibit 23(1) - copies of letter and motion, #14 Cover Letter, #15 Envelope, #16 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (copies of NEFS and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmin Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?