Frank v. Paul
Plaintiff: Kent Frank
Defendant: Paul and Warden Paul
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00484
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 08/22/19 (KNS)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this cause should be and is hereby dismissed with prejudice regarding the jurisdictional issue only and dismissed without prejudice in all other respects. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 08/22/19 (KNS)
August 19, 2019 Filing fee PAID: $ 5.00, receipt number 34643056074. (ND)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, on or before August 12, 2019, Petitioner shall complete and file the attached application OR pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 07/11/2019. [Copy of Order and application mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kent Frank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A - Kent Frank, #2 Affidavit B - Kevin Frank, #3 Affidavit C - Henry Morrison, #4 Affidavit D - Celia Frank, #5 Affidavit E - George Frank, #6 Affidavit F - Matthew Troccoli, #7 Cover Letter, #8 Envelope, #9 Notice of Assignment (KNS) (copies of NEF and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff) (Additional attachment added on 7/10/2019: #10 Notice of Assignment) (KNS). Modified on 7/10/2019 (KNS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank v. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?