McMullan v. Noxubee County School District
Plaintiff: Angela McMullan
Defendant: Noxubee County School District
Case Number: 3:2019cv00509
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Noxubee County School District answer due 9/27/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 6, 2019 (King, Steve)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Noxubee County School District (Boykin, Thurman)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thurman L. Boykin, III on behalf of Noxubee County School District (Boykin, Thurman)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela McMullan. Noxubee County School District served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Mayo, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Noxubee County School District. (LAT)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Noxubee County School District (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4041563), filed by Angela McMullan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Termination, #2 Exhibit B - Contract of Employment, #3 Exhibit C - EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMullan v. Noxubee County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela McMullan
Represented By: Brian D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noxubee County School District
Represented By: Thurman L. Boykin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?