Walker v. Jackson HMA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Walker
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Jackson HMA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00553
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 9/30/2019; Jury Trial set for the term beginning 9/1/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 3/18/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2019; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2019; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 12/20/2019; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/20/2020; Motions due by 4/1/2020 ; Settlement Conference set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson; ADR Report due by 8/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/23/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
September 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2019. Appearances: Adrian Parker and Thomas Boykin. Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Jackson HMA, LLC (Kruger, Stephen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jackson HMA, LLC.(Kruger, Stephen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thurman L. Boykin, III on behalf of Jackson HMA, LLC (Boykin, Thurman)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) Modified on 8/9/2019 (Lewis, Nijah).
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jackson HMA, LLC from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 25CI1:19-cv-249-EFP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4055645) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complete State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/9/2019) (KNS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Jackson HMA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Kruger
Represented By: Thurman L. Boykin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Walker
Represented By: Philip C. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?