Robert Smith Glass, Inc. v. ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Smith Glass, Inc.
Defendant: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC and Carter's Contracting Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00557
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: John C Gargiulo
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Reset Hearing: Due to a conflict with defense counsel's schedule, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET (TIME CHANGE ONLY) for 10/31/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendant ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 10/10/19. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/30/19 (HM)
September 28, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC (Copeland, Clyde)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Smith Glass, Inc. (Ludwig, Alston)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan M. Keup on behalf of ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC (Keup, Morgan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Vanderloo on behalf of ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC (Vanderloo, Matthew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 GENERAL DENIAL RE: ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC.(Copeland, Clyde) Modified on 9/26/2019 (VM).
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Clyde X. Copeland, III on behalf of ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC (Copeland, Clyde)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual).(Solop, Christopher)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carter's Contracting Services, Inc..(Solop, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alston Frank Ludwig on behalf of Robert Smith Glass, Inc. (Ludwig, Alston)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC, Carter's Contracting Services, Inc., and Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual). (VM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC, Carter's Contracting Services, Inc., and Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), (Filing fee $400 receipt number 34643055955), filed by Robert Smith Glass, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Proposal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Payment Bond, #3 Exhibit 3 - Applications for Payment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email Exchange, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pre-Suit Notice, #6 Exhibit 6 - Demand, #7 Exhibit 7 - Proof of Claim, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Smith Glass, Inc. v. ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smith Glass, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel C. Kelly
Represented By: Alston Frank Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)
Represented By: Christopher Solop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROTA Reese Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Clyde X. Copeland, III
Represented By: Morgan M. Keup
Represented By: Matthew W. Vanderloo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter's Contracting Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Solop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?