Bhattarai et al v. Hood et al
Plaintiff: Dipa Bhattarai and Tyler Barker
Defendant: Jim Hood, Frances Robertson, Dorothy Ennis, Hilda Bills, Deborah Coker, Darlene Smith and Sharon Clark
Case Number: 3:2019cv00560
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 Rebuttal re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Sharon Clark (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
September 26, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER terminating #13 Motion to Dismiss Nominal Damages Claim in light of Agreed Order #18 . Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on September 26, 2019. No further written order will issue. (EHP)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS NOMINAL DAMAGES CLAIM ONLY: Plaintiffs' claim for nominal damages as to all Defendants is dismissed, without prejudice. This Agreed Order does not affect any of Plaintiffs' remaining claims. Each party will bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on September 24, 2019.(SP)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Tyler Barker, Dipa Bhattarai (Rice, Aaron)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Tyler Barker, Dipa Bhattarai (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Defendant Clark to Plaintiff Bhattarai, #2 Exhibit Armstrong Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit Armstrong Defendant's Original Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Armstrong Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Armstrong Defendants' Answer to Amended Complaint)(Rice, Aaron)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 16(b)(3)(B) pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction [at docket no. 11]. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/12/2019. (JEJ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hilda Bills, Deborah Coker, Dorothy Ennis, Jim Hood, Frances Robertson, Darlene Smith.(Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Damage Claim as Barred by the Eleventh Amendment filed by Hilda Bills, Deborah Coker, Dorothy Ennis, Jim Hood, Frances Robertson, Darlene Smith (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Damage Claim as Barred by the Eleventh Amendment by Hilda Bills, Deborah Coker, Dorothy Ennis, Jim Hood, Frances Robertson, Darlene Smith (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Sharon Clark (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Sharon Clark (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov on behalf of Hilda Bills, Sharon Clark, Deborah Coker, Dorothy Ennis, Jim Hood, Frances Robertson, Darlene Smith (Miracle-State Gov, Douglas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dipa Bhattarai. Sharon Clark served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Rice, Aaron)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dipa Bhattarai. Frances Robertson served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Rice, Aaron)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dipa Bhattarai. Darlene Smith served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Rice, Aaron)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dipa Bhattarai. Hilda Bills served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Rice, Aaron)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dipa Bhattarai. Deborah Coker served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Rice, Aaron)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dipa Bhattarai. Dorothy Ennis served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Rice, Aaron)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dipa Bhattarai. Jim Hood served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Rice, Aaron)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hilda Bills, Sharon Clark, Deborah Coker, Dorothy Ennis, Jim Hood, Frances Robertson, Darlene Smith. (LAT)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Hilda Bills, Sharon Clark, Deborah Coker, Dorothy Ennis, Jim Hood, Frances Robertson, Darlene Smith ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4057976), filed by Tyler Barker, Dipa Bhattarai. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bhattarai et al v. Hood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hood
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Robertson
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Ennis
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Bills
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Coker
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Smith
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Clark
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dipa Bhattarai
Represented By: Aaron Randall Rice
Represented By: Everett E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Barker
Represented By: Aaron Randall Rice
Represented By: Everett E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?