Greenwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Greenwood
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00562
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Michael Lee Greenwood. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/28/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (Merritt, Hannalore)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Michael Lee Greenwood. (ND)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security for service upon U.S. Attorney (cwl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security: Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI and Attorney General, U.S. DOJ. (KNS)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring answer and briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/14/2019 (AG)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/14/2019 (AG)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Lee Greenwood. (KNS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michael Lee Greenwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Greenwood
Represented By: Hannalore Burns Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?