Minton v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Angela Minton
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00570
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L. Hall on behalf of Angela Minton (Hall, Derek)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory L. Radicioni on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Radicioni, Cory)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company.(Bragg, Grafton)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Minton. Allstate Insurance Company served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Timbs, Megan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company. (LAT)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643056030), filed by Angela Minton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minton v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Cory L. Radicioni
Represented By: Grafton E. Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Minton
Represented By: Megan E. Timbs
Represented By: Derek L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?