Scott v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bonnie Scott
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00574
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 RESET Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 10/18/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. (JEJ)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER Substituting Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. as Defendant and Dismissing Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from This Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/7/2019. (dcw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from Circuit Court of Madison County, MS, case number CI2019-0130. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4062600) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL RFA Responses, #3 Exhibit C - PL's Responses to WM's Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D - NOS PL RFA Responses, #5 Exhibit E - NOS - PL Responses to INT - RFP, #6 Exhibit F - Copies of process pleadings etc. served on WM, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Scott
Represented By: Samuel G. Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?