Holloman v. Mississippi Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Holloman
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections and Mississippi Department of Corrections
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00594
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Response to Order re #3 ORDER, on or before September 17, 2019, Petitioner shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/26/2019, filed by Marvin Holloman (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned to Sender "Forward Time Exp" as to #3 Order re Mail sent to Plaintiff. (KNS)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before September 17, 2019, Petitioner shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/26/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (NEF's, Receipt and Notice of Assignment) Mail sent to Marvin Holloman (MGB)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34643056093.), filed by Marvin Holloman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) (Copy of NEF and Notice of Assignment mailed to plaintiff.)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloman v. Mississippi Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Holloman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?