Milam v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Melissa M Milam
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00653
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 31, 2019 (King, Steve)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Merrida P. Coxwell, Jr on behalf of Melissa M Milam (Coxwell, Merrida)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Rand Patrick Nolen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa M Milam (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Bar of Texas - Certificate of Good Standing)(Coxwell, Merrida)
October 30, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Rand Patrick Nolen receipt number 0538-4127521 $ 100 (Coxwell, Merrida)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Attorney Elizabeth Hadley has made an entry of appearance on behalf of defendants. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 24, 2019 (King, Steve)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appear Without Pro Hac Vice Application or Local Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 24, 2019 (King, Steve)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Rand P. Nolen to Appear Without Pro Hac Vice Application or Local Counsel by Melissa M Milam. (KNS) Modified on 9/20/2019 (ASJ).
September 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9 : This document requests two motion reliefs. Each motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (KNS)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth). Added MOTION to Substitute Attorney on 9/19/2019 (KNS).
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of All Defendants (Hadley, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Letter sent to Richard B. North, Esq. on 09/11/19 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (KNS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Letter sent to Rand P. Nolen, Esq. on 09/11/19 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (KNS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03077. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
September 12, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3077-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
September 12, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13382812 filed by Melissa M Milam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milam v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa M Milam
Represented By: Rand P Nolen
Represented By: Rand P Nolen - PHV
Represented By: Merrida P. Coxwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?