Fikes v. State of Mississippi
Petitioner: Ladarron Lashon Fikes
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00658
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, on or before November 21, 2019, Petitioner shall file an amended petition consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/31/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/24/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Ladarron Fikes (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PG)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Ladarron Lashon Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ND)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Ladarron Lashon Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ND)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ladarron Lashon Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Ladarron Lashon Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Letter from M. Chandlee, #2 Envelope) (ND)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, on or before October 15, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/13/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ladarron Lashon Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fikes v. State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ladarron Lashon Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?