Turner v. Booth et al
Plaintiff: John B. Turner
Defendant: Defendants A-D, Zurich American Insurance Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Laurene Booth
Case Number: 3:2019cv00659
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed as to #17 Letter to Donna Jill Johnson, Clerk, Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, transmitting certified copies of Order to remand and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 Letter to Donna Jill Johnson, Clerk, Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, transmitting certified copies of Order to remand and docket sheet. (VM)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Sever and Remand. Accordingly, plaintiff's claims against Booth are severed and remanded to the Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi. Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants will proceed here. The Clerk of Court shall this day send a certified copy of this Order to the Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/23/2019 (VM)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Sever and Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by John B. Turner (Compton, Louis)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 State Court Record by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Sever and Remand, at docket no. #12 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/23/2019. (JEJ)
September 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12 : This document requests several motion reliefs. Every motion relief should be selected from the list of motion events or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (VM)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Sever and Remand to State Court filed by Zurich American Insurance Company (Childress, Dennis) Modified on 9/20/2019 (VM).
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Sever and Remand by Zurich American Insurance Company (Childress, Dennis). Added MOTION to Remand to State Court on 9/20/2019 (VM).
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Zurich American Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Childress, Dennis)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Old Republic Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by Old Republic Insurance Company.(Childress, Dennis)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Jason Childress on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company (Childress, Dennis)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Jason Childress on behalf of Old Republic Insurance Company (Childress, Dennis)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Grafton E. Bragg on behalf of Old Republic Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Wright Hill, Jr on behalf of Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Hill, William)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Republic Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE (Consent to Removal) by Old Republic Insurance Company (Bragg, Grafton)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE (Consent to Removal by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company) by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Hill, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, case number 19cv044(C). (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4086605) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Booth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants A-D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Grafton E. Bragg
Represented By: Dennis Jason Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis Jason Childress
Represented By: Grafton E. Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Wright Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurene Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Turner
Represented By: Louis H. Compton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?