Byars v. Asbury Management Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Janell Byars
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Asbury Automotive Mississippi L.L.C., Asbury Management Services, LLC and Asbury MS Gray-Daniels L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00660
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: David C Bramlette
Referring Judge: John C Gargiulo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Stay Case filed by Janell Byars (Adcock, Ken)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Stay Case filed by Janell Byars (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Byars Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Gann Affidavit)(Adcock, Ken)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by District Judge David C. Bramlette, III on October 18, 2019. (lda)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Stay Case by Janell Byars (Ivison, William)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Ivison on behalf of Janell Byars (Ivison, William)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER staying proceedings. In accordance with Local Uniform Civil Rule 16(b)(3)(B), proceedings in this matter are stayed pending ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, alternatively, to Stay the Litigation to Determine the Arbitration Issues #6 . NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/7/2019 (AG)
October 4, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : This document requests several motion reliefs. Every motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (LAT)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaklyn L. Wrigley on behalf of Asbury Automotive Mississippi L.L.C., Asbury MS Gray-Daniels L.L.C., Asbury Management Services, LLC (Wrigley, Jaklyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Asbury Automotive Mississippi L.L.C., Asbury MS Gray-Daniels L.L.C., Asbury Management Services, LLC (Cupp, Steven)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Asbury Automotive Mississippi L.L.C., Asbury MS Gray-Daniels L.L.C., Asbury Management Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter of Resignation, #5 Exhibit 5 - Exit Interview, #6 Exhibit 6 - Original EEOC Charge, #7 Exhibit 7 - Amended EEOC Charge)(Cupp, Steven). Added MOTION to Stay Case on 10/4/2019 (LAT).
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janell Byars. Asbury MS Gray-Daniels L.L.C. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Adcock, Ken)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janell Byars. Asbury Management Services, LLC served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Adcock, Ken)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janell Byars. Asbury Automotive Mississippi L.L.C. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Adcock, Ken)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Asbury Automotive Mississippi L.L.C., Asbury MS Gray-Daniels L.L.C., Asbury Management Services, LLC. (LAT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Asbury Automotive Mississippi L.L.C., Asbury MS Gray-Daniels L.L.C., Asbury Management Services, LLC, John Does 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4086701), filed by Janell Byars. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byars v. Asbury Management Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbury Automotive Mississippi L.L.C.
Represented By: Jaklyn L. Wrigley
Represented By: Steven R. Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbury Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Jaklyn L. Wrigley
Represented By: Steven R. Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbury MS Gray-Daniels L.L.C.
Represented By: Jaklyn L. Wrigley
Represented By: Steven R. Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janell Byars
Represented By: Ken R. Adcock
Represented By: William C. Ivison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?