Hopson v. Cooper
Plaintiff: Edward James Hopson
Defendant: Clint Cooper
Case Number: 3:2019cv00664
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clint Cooper (Tucker, Lawrence)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Clint Cooper (Tucker, Lawrence)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence John Tucker, Jr on behalf of Clint Cooper (Tucker, Lawrence)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Clint Cooper served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (KNS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Clint Cooper per #3 Order. (KNS)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. At Plaintiff's request, the Clerk shall send him a blank summons. Plaintiff may complete it and request that the summons be issued and that the USMS serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. The Clerk shall issue the summons and submit it to the USMS for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 9/25/2019. (ACF)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward James Hopson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clint Cooper, filed by Edward James Hopson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Receipt, #2 Exhibit B - Meridian Police Department Incident Report 08/08/19, #3 Exhibit C - Mike's Auto Repair Invoice, #4 Exhibit D (1) - Claim Settlement, #5 Exhibit D (2) - Objection to Safeway Denial of Repair Bill, #6 Exhibit D (3) - "Safeway Insurance Officials Is Breaching It Comprehensive Agreement Required by Policy", #7 Envelope)(KNS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #8 Cover Letter) (KNS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward James Hopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?