Pruitt v. Simpson County Sheriff Department et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Pruitt
Defendant: Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian, Donald O'Cain, Simpson County Sheriff Department, John Kilpatrick and Simpson County
Case Number: 3:2019cv00667
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Judicial Notice Hearing by Deborah Ann Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Citation, #2 Exhibit B - Document, #3 Exhibit C - Document, #4 Exhibit D - Court Document, #5 Exhibit E - Final Judgment, #6 Exhibit F - Motion, #7 Exhibit G - Final Judgment, #8 Notice of Hearing, #9 Envelope) (VM). Modified on 11/14/2019 to add Notice of Hearing and Envelope (VM).
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 Response in Opposition (OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ORDER) re #11 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Deborah Ann Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Objection, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order and Email, #3 Envelope) (VM). Modified on 11/14/2019 to add Envelope (VM).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 16(b)(3)(B) pending a decision on the MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(B)(6) at docket no. #11 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/12/2019. (JEJ)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(B)(6)) filed by John Kilpatrick, Donald O'Cain, Simpson County, Simpson County Sheriff Department, Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian (Bland, Mallory)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(B)(6)) by John Kilpatrick, Donald O'Cain, Simpson County, Simpson County Sheriff Department, Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Search Warrant for Blood Draw and Supporting Affidavit)(Bland, Mallory)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. John Kilpatrick answer due 11/8/2019; Donald O'Cain answer due 11/8/2019; Simpson County answer due 11/8/2019; Simpson County Sheriff Department answer due 11/8/2019; Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian answer due 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/15/2019. (dcw)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Deborah Ann Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cwl)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Deborah Ann Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Envelope)(VM)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, by John Kilpatrick, Donald O'Cain, Simpson County, Simpson County Sheriff Department, Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian (Bland, Mallory)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mallory K. Bland on behalf of John Kilpatrick, Donald O'Cain, Simpson County, Simpson County Sheriff Department, Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian (Bland, Mallory)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Marsh on behalf of John Kilpatrick, Donald O'Cain, Simpson County, Simpson County Sheriff Department, Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian (Marsh, Jason)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Simpson County, Simpson County Sheriff Department, Donald O'Cain, Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian, John Kilpatrick, filed by Deborah Ann Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibit B - Citation, #3 Exhibit C - Citations, #4 Exhibit D - Order/Docket, #5 Exhibit E - Order of Dismissal, #6 Exhibit F - Motion, #7 Exhibit G - Final Judgment)(VM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pro-Se (Non-Prisoner) Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically, by Deborah Ann Pruitt. (VM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Simpson County, Simpson County Sheriff Department, Donald O'Cain, Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian, John Kilpatrick. (VM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Simpson County, Simpson County Sheriff Department, Donald O'Cain, Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian, and John Kilpatrick, (Filing fee $400 receipt number 34643056440), filed by Deborah Ann Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Claim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruitt v. Simpson County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Elizabeth Sundeen-McMillian
Represented By: Mallory K. Bland
Represented By: Jason T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald O'Cain
Represented By: Mallory K. Bland
Represented By: Jason T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson County Sheriff Department
Represented By: Mallory K. Bland
Represented By: Jason T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kilpatrick
Represented By: Mallory K. Bland
Represented By: Jason T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson County
Represented By: Mallory K. Bland
Represented By: Jason T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?