Todd v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marianne Todd
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00699
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Aetna, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Cleveland, Ollie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Cleveland, Ollie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims, MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Cleveland, Ollie)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life Insurance Company from County Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, case number CA19-0921. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4099224) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents; #2 Exhibit B - Plan Document; #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (VM). Modified on 9/30/2019 (VM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Todd
Represented By: Stephen Paul Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ollie A. Cleveland, III
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim - PHV, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?