Morales v. Premier Employee Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Hannah Morales
Defendant: Premier Employee Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00745
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer & Defenses by Premier Employee Solutions, LLC.(McCharen, Silas)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hannah Morales. Premier Employee Solutions, LLC served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Nisbett, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Premier Employee Solutions, LLC. (MGB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Premier Employee Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643056885), filed by Hannah Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Premier Employee Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Employee Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Silas W. McCharen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Morales
Represented By: John W. Nisbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?