Fikes v. Sollie et al
Plaintiff: Ladarron Lashon Fikes
Defendant: Tonya Anderson, Billy Sollie and Lauderdale County, Mississippi
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00755
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, on or before December 30, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/9/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order.; *RESTRICTED* granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 11/18/201. [Copy mailed to plaintiff and Lauderdale County Detention Facillty] (LDR)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Ladarron Lashon Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ladarron Lashon Fikes (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKM)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, on or before November 25, 2019, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/24/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/24/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ladarron Lashon Fikes (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKM)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tonya Anderson, Lauderdale County, Mississippi, Billy Sollie, filed by Ladarron Lashon Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fikes v. Sollie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Sollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauderdale County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladarron Lashon Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?