Evans v. Updyke
Plaintiff: Edwin Gilbert Evans
Defendant: Daniel Updyke
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00756
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Edwin Gilbert Evans (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MGB)
December 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to [#14]: Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MGB)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 Change of Address to P. O. Box 88550, Bldg B Zone C Bed 46, Pearl, MS 39208 filed by Edwin Gilbert Evans (MGB)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 ****ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 Acknowledgement filed by Edwin Gilbert Evans. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MGB) Modified on 12/16/2019 (MGB).
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Updyke. Daniel Updyke waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Dare, Jason)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Edward Dare on behalf of Daniel Updyke (Dare, Jason)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #8 Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6,,, #10 Request for Waiver of Service, #9 Order,. Mail sent to Edwin Gilbert Evans (MGB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Daniel Updyke on 11/18/2019. Waiver of Service due by 12/18/2019. (LDR)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, the Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendant Daniel Updyke. The Defendant is directed to file a signed Waiver form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons - Daniel Updyke, Sergeant - Rankin County Detention Center, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(LDR)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order.; *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/18/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff and Sheriff, Rankin County Detention Center] (LDR)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT by Edwin Gilbert Evans (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Edwin Gilbert Evans (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Edwin Gilbert Evans. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKM)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, on or before November 25, 2019, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/24/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/24/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Edwin Gilbert Evans (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKM)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Updyke, filed by Edwin Gilbert Evans. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) (Copy of NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to plaintiff.)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Updyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Gilbert Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Updyke
Represented By: Jason Edward Dare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?