Gates v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Valerie Gates
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00758
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Valerie Gates. All Defendants. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (Clark, Ricky)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (PG)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring answer and briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/6/2019 (AG)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/6/2019 (AG)
November 6, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Court staff was advised by chambers that the document was incorrectly filed as a amended document. It should have been docketed as an active IFP motion. Court staff made the necessary changes. (LAT)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Valerie Gates. Amendment to #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Amended Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Clark, Ricky) Modified on 11/6/2019 (LAT).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must properly complete the Application to proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs on or before November 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/28/2019 (AG)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Valerie Gates (cwl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Valerie Gates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Gates
Represented By: Ricky Brian Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?