Gyawali v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Shardul Gyawali
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv00762
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shardul Gyawali. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/31/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gahagan - PHV, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shardul Gyawali. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gahagan - PHV, Michael)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shardul Gyawali. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gahagan - PHV, Michael)
December 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Proof of Service of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attachment of a U. S. Postal return receipt, or other attachment is not sufficient without completed proof. Attorney is directed to refile using AO form 440 and may attach Doc. #4 as an exhibit with a description. (KNS)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Secretary of DHS, Office of the General Counsel on 11/01/2019, filed by Shardul Gyawali. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Gahagan - PHV, Michael) Modified on 12/17/2019 (KNS).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael W. Gahagan is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff Shardul Gyawali and in association with local counsel upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/1/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
October 30, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Michael W. Gahagan, $ 100, receipt number 34643056997. (ND)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Michael W. Gahagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shardul Gyawali (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Peterson, Abigail)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ND)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Injunctive and Mandamus Relief against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-4123396), filed by Shardul Gyawali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Case Status Online, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gyawali v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shardul Gyawali
Represented By: Abigail M. Peterson
Represented By: Michael W. Gahagan - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?