Phillips v. Rent-A-Center East, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Phillips, Jr.
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Rent-A-Center East, LLC, General Motors, LLC and Rent-A-Center East, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00776
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Rent-A-Center East, Inc w/Prejudice by Jason Phillips, Jr (Horton-Williams, Tiffany)
December 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 : Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Section 2.C. and FED.R.Civ.P.11 an attorney's password issued by the court combined with the user's identification (login) serves as the attorney's signature for Rule 11 and other purposes. Attorneys should not permit other attorneys to use their login and password for any ECF filing. Document #10 will be disregarded and the attorney with the electronic signature on the document should re-file document.(PKM)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Rent-a-Center East, Inc. w/Prejudice by Rent-A-Center East, Inc. (Alexander, Amanda) Modified on 12/27/2019 (PKM).
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal as General Motors, LLC w/PREJUDICE by Jason Phillips, Jr (Horton-Williams, Tiffany)
November 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rent-A-Center East, Inc. answer due 12/26/2019. (AG)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Additional Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Rent-A-Center East, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to 12/26/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/26/2019 (AG)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's #5 Amended Complaint Deadline by Rent-A-Center East, Inc. (Alexander, Amanda)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Green Alexander on behalf of Rent-A-Center East, Inc. (Alexander, Amanda)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Response to Order re #3 ORDER requiring briefing on subject matter jurisdiction. On or before November 22, 2019, Plaintiff must file a response to this Order or an amended complaint addressing this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/1/2019 (AG) filed by Jason Phillips, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rent-A-Center East, Inc.s Annual Report, #2 Exhibit B - General Motors, LLCs Annual Report)(Horton-Williams, Tiffany)
November 1, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to [#4]: Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc. [#5]. (MGB)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC, John Does 1-10, Rent-A-Center East, LLC, filed by Jason Phillips, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horton-Williams, Tiffany)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY**AMENDED COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC, John Does 1-10, Rent-A-Center East, LLC, filed by Jason Phillips, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horton-Williams, Tiffany) Modified on 11/1/2019 (MGB).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring briefing on subject matter jurisdiction. On or before November 22, 2019, Plaintiff must file a response to this Order or an amended complaint addressing this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/1/2019 (AG)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC, Rent-A-Center East, LLC. (PKM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, WITH JURY DEMAND, against General Motors, LLC, John Does 1-10, Rent-A-Center East, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643057015), filed by Jason Phillips, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Uniform Crash Report, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Rent-A-Center East, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tiffany Horton-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Center East, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Center East, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Green Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?