Houston v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sylvia A. Houston
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00799
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (VM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Sylvia Houston. (Attachments: #1 Consent signed by S.Houston, #2 Envelope) (VM)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/14/19 (CCO)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Copy mailed to address most recently provided by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/14/19 (CCO)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/13/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sylvia A. Houston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Sylvia A. Houston. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia A. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?