Steel Service Corporation v. Lincoln Electric Company of Canada, L.P.
Plaintiff: Steel Service Corporation
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Company of Canada, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00800
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Electric Company of Canada, L.P. (Bell, Lewis)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
November 8, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (LAT)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lincoln Electric Company of Canada, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bell, Lewis)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Lincoln Electric Company of Canada, L.P. from Rankin County Circuit Court, MS, case number 19-222. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643057161) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- A copy of all process, pleadings and orders, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steel Service Corporation v. Lincoln Electric Company of Canada, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steel Service Corporation
Represented By: David Watkins Mockbee
Represented By: David B. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Company of Canada, L.P.
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?