McKinley v. Moffitt et al
Plaintiff: Alvin R. McKinley
Defendant: James L. Moffitt and Mofco Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00803
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendants' #4 Motion to stay the discovery propounded in state court; no responses are due until 30 days after CMC. Discovery shall commence after the CMC, in accordance with the local rules. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/20/2019. (ACF)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Mofco Logistics, LLC, James L. Moffitt (Vaughn, Ross)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mofco Logistics, LLC, James L. Moffitt.(Vaughn, Ross)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mofco Logistics, LLC, James L. Moffitt from Circuit - Hinds, case number 19-636. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4134738) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinley v. Moffitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin R. McKinley
Represented By: Joe N. Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Moffitt
Represented By: Ross Douglas Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mofco Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Ross Douglas Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?