Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and John Does A-Z
Case Number: 3:2019cv00810
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Watt, W.)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Virden, Gregory)
December 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to [#5]: A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (MGB)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Virden, Gregory)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Lee Watt on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Watt, W.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Gatling on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Gatling, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (cwl)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Does 1-10, John Does A-Z, Electrolux Home Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4136888), filed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: W. Lee Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr.
Represented By: Michael C. Gatling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?