King et al v. Jaxon Energy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Mitchell, Misty Tracy, Jaime King, Dustin Holmes, D'Angelo Hopkins and Shaquille Stamps
Defendant: Jaxon Energy, LLC, Zachary D. Kent, Smitty's Supply, Inc., Emerald Partners, LLC and Edgar Ray Smith, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv00825
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Rebuttal re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dustin Holmes, D'Angelo Hopkins, Jaime King, Joshua Mitchell, Shaquille Stamps, Misty Tracy (Quin, William)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 Response in Opposition to #2 Motion to Remand filed by Emerald Partners, LLC, Jaxon Energy, LLC, Zachary D. Kent, Edgar Ray Smith, III, Smitty's Supply, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Emerald Partners, LLC, Jaxon Energy, LLC, Zachary D. Kent, Edgar Ray Smith, III, Smitty's Supply, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #2 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/10/2019. (JEJ)
December 4, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Responses due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on December 4, 2019 (NF)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Emerald Partners, LLC, Jaxon Energy, LLC, Zachary D. Kent, Edgar Ray Smith, III, Smitty's Supply, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by Zachary D. Kent.(Adams, Douglas)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Joint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Emerald Partners, LLC, Jaxon Energy, LLC, Edgar Ray Smith, III, Smitty's Supply, Inc..(Smith, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dustin Holmes, D'Angelo Hopkins, Jaime King, Joshua Mitchell, Shaquille Stamps, Misty Tracy (Quin, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dustin Holmes, D'Angelo Hopkins, Jaime King, Joshua Mitchell, Shaquille Stamps, Misty Tracy (Quin, William)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Emerald Partners, LLC, Jaxon Energy, LLC, Zachary D. Kent, Edgar Ray Smith, III, Smitty's Supply, Inc. from Hinds County Circuit Court, case number 19-699. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4140450) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Certified State Court Record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Jaxon Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaxon Energy, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary D. Kent
Represented By: Jesse Mitchell, III
Represented By: Douglas E. Adams, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smitty's Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald Partners, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Ray Smith, III
Represented By: Michael S. Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Mitchell
Represented By: William M. Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Tracy
Represented By: William M. Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime King
Represented By: William M. Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Holmes
Represented By: William M. Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Angelo Hopkins
Represented By: William M. Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaquille Stamps
Represented By: William M. Quin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?