Smith v. Three R's, LLC
Plaintiff: Jamie D. Smith
Defendant: Three R's, LLC and McDonald
Case Number: 3:2019cv00827
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie D. Smith. Three R's, LLC served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Espy, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint & Defenses by Three R's, LLC.(McCharen, Silas)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed Motion #3 for Extension of Time to Answer. Three R's, LLC answer due 12/27/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/3/2019. (dcw)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Three R's, LLC (Murray, Christopher)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Three R's, LLC. (cwl)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Three R's, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4140784), filed by Jamie D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Three R's, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three R's, LLC
Represented By: Silas W. McCharen
Represented By: Christopher H. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald
Represented By: Silas W. McCharen
Represented By: Christopher H. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher William Espy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?