Miller v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Lorraine Miller
Defendant: Dean Morris LLC, Rushmore Loan Servicing, U.S. Bank National Association and Varnado Properties
Case Number: 3:2019cv00853
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick N. Salvo, III on behalf of Rushmore Loan Servicing, U.S. Bank National Association, Varnado Properties (Salvo, Frederick)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Varnado Properties.(Warren, Joseph)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Dean Morris LLC.(Price, Elizabeth)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Rushmore Loan Servicing, U.S. Bank National Association.(Warren, Joseph)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dean Morris LLC, Rushmore Loan Servicing, U.S. Bank National Association, Varnado Properties. (PG)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, against Dean Morris LLC, Rushmore Loan Servicing, U.S. Bank National Association, Varnado Properties ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 3464-3057320), filed by Lorraine Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Bankruptcy Filing, #4 Exhibit C - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit D - Letter, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F - Complaint Cease and Desist Order, #8 Exhibit G - Letter, #9 Exhibit H - Letter, #10 Exhibit I - Abstract of Judgment from Justice Court).(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Morris LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Crowell Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Servicing
Represented By: Frederick N. Salvo, III.
Represented By: Joseph Lott Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Frederick N. Salvo, III.
Represented By: Joseph Lott Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varnado Properties
Represented By: Frederick N. Salvo, III.
Represented By: Joseph Lott Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?