Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc. v. Landmark Technology A, LLC
Plaintiff: Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc.
Defendant: Landmark Technology A, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00869
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc. (Dyess - PHV, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as a motion. Attorney is directed to refile using the correct event, Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (VM)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc. (Williams, Michael) Modified on 1/23/2020 (VM).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Landmark Technology A, LLC answer due 1/24/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on January 13, 2020 (King, Steve)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Landmark Technology A, LLC by Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc. (Williams, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed by Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc.. (Williams, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Dyess - PHV on behalf of Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc. (Dyess - PHV, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on November 27, 2019 (King, Steve)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Landmark Technology A, LLC. (VM)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Jeffrey D. Dyess to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4150122) by Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing - Jeffrey D. Dyess)(Williams, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc. (Williams, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Landmark Technology A, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4149533), filed by Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 2019 First Letter to So Pipe, #2 Exhibit B - November 2019 2nd Letter to So Pipe, #3 Exhibit C - Lockwood Patent Information, #4 Exhibit D - USPTO PTAB Info, #5 Exhibit E - March 2019 Letter to So Pipe, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc. v. Landmark Technology A, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Technology A, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Pipe & Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Dyess - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?