Energy Intelligence Group, Inc et al v. Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited and Energy Intelligence Group, Inc
Defendant: Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00898
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Offer of Judgment, #2 Exhibit B Acceptance)(Thompson, Lynn)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert Lester Powley is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs Energy lntelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) and in association with local counsel upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 1/24/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Robert Lester Powley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4190400) by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Certificate of Good Standing)(Thompson, Lynn)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Stephen M. Ankrom is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs Energy lntelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) and in association with local counsel upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 1/15/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Stephen M. Ankrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4181764) by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Certificate of Good Standing)(Thompson, Lynn)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc by Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc..(Heidelberg, Cecil)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. W. Scott Hastings and Joseph A. Unis, Jr. are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. and in association with local counsel upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/31/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Joseph A. Unis, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4170503) by Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing)(Heidelberg, Cecil)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for W. Scott Hastings to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4170499) by Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing)(Heidelberg, Cecil)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. answer due 1/14/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/30/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. (Heidelberg, Cecil)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecil Maison Heidelberg on behalf of Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. (Heidelberg, Cecil)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Kevin Watson on behalf of Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. (Watson, John)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc, Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited. Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Thompson, Lynn)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Solop on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Solop, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Koeing Limited for Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited, Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. (Thompson, Lynn)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. (PG)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAILING OF "Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action of Appeal Regarding a Copyright" re #1 Complaint. (PG)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4157227), filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc, and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Weekly Newsletter, #3 Exhibit B - Copyright Registration, #4 Exhibit C - Copyright Notice, #5 Exhibit D - Subscription Agreement)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc et al v. Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergon Oil Purchasing, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Unis - PHV, Jr.
Represented By: W. Scott Hastings - PHV
Represented By: John Kevin Watson
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited
Represented By: Christopher Solop
Represented By: Lynn Patton Thompson
Represented By: Robert L. Powley - PHV
Represented By: Stephen M. Ankrom - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc
Represented By: Christopher Solop
Represented By: Lynn Patton Thompson
Represented By: Robert L. Powley - PHV
Represented By: Stephen M. Ankrom - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?