Burrow v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ramona Burrow
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00937
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE UPON CONSENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 2/14/2020 (VM)
February 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson no longer assigned to case. (VM)
February 14, 2020 District Judge Henry T. Wingate no longer assigned to case. (VM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (VM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ramona Burrow. (VM)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case: U S Attorney served on 2/6/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. (VM)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (VM) Modified on 1/8/2020 (VM).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 1/6/20 (CCO)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 1/6/20 (CCO)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/30/2019 (Lewis, Nijah)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT #2 Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ramona Burrow. (PG)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ramona Burrow. (PG)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Ramona Burrow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrow v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Burrow
Represented By: Hannalore Burns Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?