Clincy et al v. Hinds County School District
Plaintiff: Tondee Clincy, Others Similarly Situated, Lashonda Whavers and Trina D Shelton
Defendant: Hinds County School District
Case Number: 3:2020cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 3/13/2020 ; Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 9/17/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2020; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 3/20/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 6/17/2020; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 7/17/2020 ; Motions due by 10/1/2020; Settlement Conference set for 9/3/2020 02:00 PM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson; ADR Report due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 2/20/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
February 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 2/20/2020. Participants: Joel Dillard and Elizabeth Maron. Court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah)
February 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Tondee Clincy (individually) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Offer of Judgment)(Dillard, Joel)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Plaintiff's Opt-Ins by Tondee Clincy, Others Similarly Situated, Trina D Shelton, Lashonda Whavers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Opt-Ins 2)(Dillard, Joel)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Hinds County School District.(Maron, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Opt-ins by Tondee Clincy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of Opt-ins)(Dillard, Joel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hinds County School District, filed by Tondee Clincy, Others Similarly Situated, Trina D Shelton, Lashonda Whavers.(Dillard, Joel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hinds County School District.(Maron, Elizabeth)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendant Hinds County School District (Maron, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Hinds County School District from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 19-717. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643057834) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clincy et al v. Hinds County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tondee Clincy
Represented By: Joel F. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Joel F. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashonda Whavers
Represented By: Joel F. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina D Shelton
Represented By: Joel F. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinds County School District
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Maron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?