LawHQ, LLC et al v. Kilgore
Plaintiff: LawHQ, LLC and Thomas Alvord
Defendant: Adam Kilgore
Case Number: 3:2020cv00045
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gregory Beck is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff LawHQ, LLC in association with local counsel, upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/12/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Gregory Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4228804) by LawHQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Clanton, Bradley)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Beck as same does not comply with L.U.CIV.R. 83.1(d)(4) which states the application is to be "...accompanied by a certificate of good standing issued within ninety days of the date of the application by the licensing authority..." where the applicant has been admitted to practice law. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/4/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Rebecca Evans is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff LawHQ, LLC in association with local counsel, upon payment of the pro hac admission fee and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/4/20 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Gregory Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4222734) by LawHQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Clanton, Bradley)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Rebecca Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4222684) by LawHQ, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing District Court, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing State Court)(Clanton, Bradley)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adam Kilgore. (MGB)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adam Kilgore ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4190677), filed by LawHQ, LLC, Thomas Alvord. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LawHQ, LLC et al v. Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LawHQ, LLC
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Alvord
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?