Brown v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Brown
Defendant: G.V. (Sonny) Montgomery VA Medical Center, United States Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00063
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Brown. United States of America on Department of Veterans Affairs U.S. of America Attorney's Office served on 3/10/2020 answer due 5/11/2020. (PG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Brown. United States of America on Veterans' Administration Medical Center on 3/6/2020 answer due 5/5/2020. (PG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Brown. The United States of America, Veterans' Administration Medical Center served on 3/6/2020 answer due 5/5/2020. (PG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Brown. United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs served on 3/6/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (PG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Brown. United States of America served on Department of Veterans Affairs on 3/6/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (PG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (PG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed G.V. (Sonny) Montgomery VA Medical Center served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020; United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (PG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against The United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America Veterans Administration Medical Center, filed by Jerry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Claim for Damage Injury or Death, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Motion #3 for Leave to File Amended Complaint, Summons, and Civil Cover Sheet. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/26/2020. (dcw)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, Summons and Civil Cover Sheet filed by Jerry Brown. (PG)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, Summons and Civil Cover Sheet by Jerry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Claim For Damage, Injury, or Death)(PG)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to G.V. (Sonny) Montgomery VA Medical Center and United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (PG)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G.V. (Sonny) Montgomery VA Medical Center, United States Department of Veterans Affairs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643058203), filed by Jerry Brown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Claim for Damage, Injury or Death, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.V. (Sonny) Montgomery VA Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?