Barlow et al v. Phillips
Plaintiff: Lyman E. Johnson, Jr., Linda P. Byrd, Sherron G. Sandifer, Debra A. Hodge, Patsy Y. Harveston, Lois B. Landry, Bryan L. Windham, Connie L. Saxton, Patricia C. Roberts, Ralph H. Barlow, Elaine D. Moss, Hal C. Moss, Jr., Michael L. McDavid, Thomas E. Dees, Laura A. McDavid, Robert H. Landry, Jr., Mel L. McCoy, Edgar C. Fellows, Jackie R. Boteler and Sheila L. Chain
Defendant: Logan Burch Phillips, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00095
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AGREED ORDER granting #18 Motion to Extend Deadline. Plaintiffs shall file their Rebuttal in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment on or before April 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 4/1/2020 (Lewis, Nijah)
April 1, 2020 Filing 18 Second MOTION to Extend Rebuttal Deadline by Ralph H. Barlow, Jackie R. Boteler, Linda P. Byrd, Sheila L. Chain, Thomas E. Dees, Edgar C. Fellows, Patsy Y. Harveston, Debra A. Hodge, Lyman E. Johnson, Jr, Lois B. Landry, Robert H. Landry, Jr, Mel L. McCoy, Laura A. McDavid, Michael L. McDavid, Elaine D. Moss, Hal C. Moss, Jr, Patricia C. Roberts, Sherron G. Sandifer, Connie L. Saxton, Bryan L. Windham (Lee, Judson)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Deadline. Plaintiffs shall file their Rebuttal in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment on or before April 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/19/2020 (Lewis, Nijah)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Rebuttal Deadline by Ralph H. Barlow, Jackie R. Boteler, Linda P. Byrd, Sheila L. Chain, Thomas E. Dees, Edgar C. Fellows, Patsy Y. Harveston, Debra A. Hodge, Lyman E. Johnson, Jr, Lois B. Landry, Robert H. Landry, Jr, Mel L. McCoy, Laura A. McDavid, Michael L. McDavid, Elaine D. Moss, Hal C. Moss, Jr, Patricia C. Roberts, Sherron G. Sandifer, Connie L. Saxton, Bryan L. Windham (Lee, Judson)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, re #1 Notice of Removal containing removed Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment filed by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Rushing, Stevie) Modified on 3/18/2020 (cwl).
March 18, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #14 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. (cwl)
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,, MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT filed by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Rushing, Stevie) Modified on 3/18/2020 (cwl).
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Notice of Removal containing removed Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment filed by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint by Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, filed on June 5, 2019 [Doc. 1], #2 Exhibit 2, Part 1 - Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #3 Exhibit 2, Part 2 - Exhibits 1&2 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #4 Exhibit 2, Part 3 - Exhibits 3&4 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award - to be filed under seal, #5 Exhibit 2, Part 4 - Exhibit 5 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #6 Exhibit 2, Part 5 - Exhibit 6 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #7 Exhibit 2, Part 6 - Exhibits 7-10 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #8 Exhibit 2, Part 7 - Exhibit 11 (Pages 1-40) to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #9 Exhibit 2, Part 8 - Exhibit 11 (Pages 41-87) to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #10 Exhibit 2, Part 9 - Exhibit 12 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #11 Exhibit 2, Part 10 - Exhibits 13 (Pages 1-100) to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #12 Exhibit 2, Part 11 - Exhibits 13 (Pages 101-140) to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #13 Exhibit 2, Part 12 - Exhibits 13 (Pages 141-189) to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #14 Exhibit 2, Part 13 - Exhibit 14 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #15 Exhibit 2, Part 14 - Exhibits 15-88 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award - to be filed under seal, #16 Exhibit 3 - MOL in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #17 Exhibit 4 - Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, filed on August 5, 2019 [Doc. 44]rd, #18 Exhibit 5 - Answer re Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, #19 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Supplemental Authority, #20 Exhibit 7 - Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, filed on August 23, 2019 [Doc. 50])(Rushing, Stevie) Modified on 3/18/2020 (cwl).
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Defenses to the removed Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr.(Rushing, Stevie)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Document RESTRICTED from public by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Rushing, Stevie)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY*** ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Defenses to the removed Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr.(Blackwood, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/17/2020 (MGB).
March 17, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 : Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Section 2.C. and FED.R.Civ.P.11 an attorney's password issued by the court combined with the user's identification (login) serves as the attorney's signature for Rule 11 and other purposes. Attorneys should not permit other attorneys to use their login and password for any ECF filing. Document [# 10] will be disregarded and the attorney with the electronic signature on the document should re-file document. (MGB)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Redline)(Rushing, Stevie)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 ATTACHMENT re #6 Response in Opposition,, by Ralph H. Barlow, Jackie R. Boteler, Linda P. Byrd, Sheila L. Chain, Thomas E. Dees, Edgar C. Fellows, Patsy Y. Harveston, Debra A. Hodge, Lyman E. Johnson, Jr, Lois B. Landry, Robert H. Landry, Jr, Mel L. McCoy, Laura A. McDavid, Michael L. McDavid, Elaine D. Moss, Hal C. Moss, Jr, Patricia C. Roberts, Sherron G. Sandifer, Connie L. Saxton, Bryan L. Windham (Greenlee, Robert)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Ralph H. Barlow, Jackie R. Boteler, Linda P. Byrd, Sheila L. Chain, Thomas E. Dees, Edgar C. Fellows, Patsy Y. Harveston, Debra A. Hodge, Lyman E. Johnson, Jr, Lois B. Landry, Robert H. Landry, Jr, Mel L. McCoy, Laura A. McDavid, Michael L. McDavid, Elaine D. Moss, Hal C. Moss, Jr, Patricia C. Roberts, Sherron G. Sandifer, Connie L. Saxton, Bryan L. Windham (Greenlee, Robert)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Response in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Rushing, Stevie) filed by Ralph H. Barlow, Jackie R. Boteler, Linda P. Byrd, Sheila L. Chain, Thomas E. Dees, Edgar C. Fellows, Patsy Y. Harveston, Debra A. Hodge, Lyman E. Johnson, Jr, Lois B. Landry, Robert H. Landry, Jr, Mel L. McCoy, Laura A. McDavid, Michael L. McDavid, Elaine D. Moss, Hal C. Moss, Jr, Patricia C. Roberts, Sherron G. Sandifer, Connie L. Saxton, Bryan L. Windham (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Award Service Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Case View FINRA Dispute Resolution)(Greenlee, Robert)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #5 Motion to Extend Deadline; response due 3/17/2020. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 3/5/2020. (ACF)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Response to Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment Deadline by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Rushing, Stevie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Rushing, Stevie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Rushing, Stevie)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R. Blackwood on behalf of Logan Burch Phillips, Jr (Blackwood, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Logan Burch Phillips, Jr from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 20-cv-89. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4212375) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Statement of Claim, #2 Exhibit B- Original Statement of Claim, #3 Exhibit C- Docket & Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlow et al v. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyman E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda P. Byrd
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherron G. Sandifer
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra A. Hodge
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Y. Harveston
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois B. Landry
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan L. Windham
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie L. Saxton
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia C. Roberts
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph H. Barlow
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine D. Moss
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal C. Moss, Jr.
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. McDavid
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Dees
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura A. McDavid
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert H. Landry, Jr.
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel L. McCoy
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar C. Fellows
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie R. Boteler
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila L. Chain
Represented By: Judson Morgan Lee
Represented By: Robert V. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Burch Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Blackwood
Represented By: Stevie F. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?