Hill v. Sollie
Plaintiff: Shamell Antwane Hill
Defendant: Sheriff Billie Sollie and Billy Sollie
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2020cv00113
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Respondents Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shamell Antwane Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Billy Sollie (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (initial Appearance), #2 Exhibit B (Waiver of Preliminary Hearing), #3 Exhibit C (Petition for Appointment of Counsel), #4 Exhibit D (Motion to Reduce Bond))(Owens-State Gov, Jerrolyn)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to Judge Ball, re: Greivance Forms) from Shamell A. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Inmate Grievance Report, #2 Envelope) (PG)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Lynn Fitch served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (PG)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Respondent Sollie shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service upon the Attorney General of the State of Mississippi of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/13/2020. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shamell Antwane Hill. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Plaintiff Shamell Antwane Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, on or before March 23, 2020, Petitioner shall file an amended petition consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/2/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/28/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shamell Antwane Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PG)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shamell Antwane Hill. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope)(PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Sollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamell Antwane Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Billie Sollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Sollie
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens-State Gov
Represented By: Lynn Fitch-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?